Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastien de Rosmadec

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornTheix
14 Nov 162237.8AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
11 Feb 162439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
29 Jul 164661.5DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastien de Rosmadec:
Bishop Sebastien de Rosmadec (born 1585, died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015