Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodosio Maria Gargiulo

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1845Born
18 Dec 186924.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189549.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oria, Italy
18 Mar 189549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
24 Mar 189549.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
21 Jun 189549.7SucceededBishop of Oria, Italy
16 Dec 190257.1DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teodosio Maria Gargiulo (VIAF: 307366903)
Bishop Teodosio Maria Gargiulo (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce
Ordained BishopTor dei Spechi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 416, and Page 576
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017