Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Gagliardi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1786Born
17 Mar 181024.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 184558.9SelectedBishop of Ischia, Italy
21 Apr 184559.2ConfirmedBishop of Ischia, Italy
Jun 1845²59.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
31 May 185468.3ResignedBishop of Ischia, Italy
5 Apr 185670.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gagliardi
Bishop Luigi Gagliardi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta, Diocese of Barletta
Death PlaceMolfetta, Diocese of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 226
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 25
  • c2: AT, 14 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jun 2018

Quantcast