Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Celaja

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1711BornSan Silvestri
21 Dec 174837.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 177160.2SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Mar 177260.6ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
5 Apr 177260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
Mar 1780³68.5DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Celaja:
Bishop Enrico Celaja (born , died Mar 1780) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015