Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Adami, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610BornKöln-Mühlheim
162818.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Feb 163323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 165243.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
16 Dec 165243.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
23 Mar 165343.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
19 Feb 166353.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adam Adami:
Bishop Adam Adami O.S.B. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013