Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria d’Este

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1743BornVenezia
7 May 178036.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 178137.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
27 May 178137.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
26 Sep 178542.0AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
17 May 182177.6DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria d’Este:
Bishop Francesco Maria d’Este (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 355
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015