Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Benincasa, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1731Born
14 Sep 176029.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 176029.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 176735.4ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Nov 177948.1SelectedBishop of Carpi, Italy
13 Dec 177948.2ConfirmedBishop of Carpi, Italy
9 Apr 178048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
13 Dec 179362.2DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Benincasa
Bishop Francesco Benincasa S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassuolo

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,215
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast