Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Antônio dos Santos

Deceased

Bishop of Diamantina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1818³BornSão Gonçalo do Rio Preto
21 Dec 184426.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jan 184526.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 186344.6SelectedBishop of Diamantina, Brazil
28 Sep 186344.9ConfirmedBishop of Diamantina, Brazil
1 May 186445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Diamantina, Brazil
17 May 190586.5DiedBishop of Diamantina, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Antônio dos Santos:
Bishop João Antônio dos Santos (born , died ) Bishop of Diamantina

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013