Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aniceto Ferrante, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1823Born
28 Aug 184016.9ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
29 May 184723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
21 Mar 187349.4AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
23 Mar 187349.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
Apr 1879³55.5ResignedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
12 May 187955.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
19 Jan 188359.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aniceto Ferrante (VIAF: 163745732)
Bishop Aniceto Ferrante C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtina, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173, and Page 281
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 Nov 2016
  • bd: AT, 24 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,198
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast