Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Anton von Federspiel

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1708BornSchloss Fürstenburg
22 Jul 173122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
6 Feb 175546.2SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
21 Jul 175546.7ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
14 Sep 175546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
27 Feb 177768.3DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Anton von Federspiel:
Bishop Johann Baptist Anton von Federspiel (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Oct 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015