Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Vintler von Runkelstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1631³BornBrixen
21 Mar 165423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
10 May 165423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
22 Dec 168150.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
22 Dec 168150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
15 Feb 168251.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
9 Mar 169766.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Vintler von Runkelstein:
Bishop Wilhelm von Vintler von Runkelstein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015