Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesse Perghoffer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1604BornBrixen
23 Dec 162824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 May 164843.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 May 164843.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
14 Jun 164843.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
31 May 168176.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jesse Perghoffer:
Bishop Jesse Perghoffer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015