Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Rovello (Roveglio)

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 May 1580AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Feltre, Italy
20 May 1580AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
19 Jun 1580Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
1584SucceededBishop of Feltre, Italy
17 Dec 1610DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Rovello (Roveglio)
Bishop Giacomo Rovello (Roveglio) (died ) Bishop of Feltre

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Thomas in Pariona, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195, and Page 208
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,820

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast