Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Molino

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1705Born
7 Jun 172722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 172823.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 175549.8AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1 Apr 175549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
23 Nov 176156.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 176964.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
14 Mar 177367.8DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Molino (VIAF: 9224103)
Giovanni Cardinal Molino (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast