Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Macario Valenti

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1673³BornNapoli
7 Sep 173360.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Sep 173360.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 173360.7AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
15 Nov 173360.8Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
10 Apr 174471.2DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Macario Valenti:
Bishop Giovanni Macario Valenti (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 10.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015