Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Cesare Salicini

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1591AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
3 May 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
11 Oct 1606DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Salicini (VIAF: 44406469)
Bishop Giulio Cesare Salicini (died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 29, Number 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast