Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Fabri

Deceased

Bishop of Orange, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
5 Sep 166759.6AppointedBishop of Orange, France
15 Apr 166860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
27 Aug 167466.6DiedBishop of Orange, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Fabri
Bishop Alexander Fabri (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Orange

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBertinoro, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast