Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boetius Egan, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹Born
9 Jun 162540.4AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
19 Jul 162641.5Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
19 Apr 165065.2DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boetius Egan
Bishop Boetius Egan O.F.M. Obs. (born 1585, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuam
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Church, Drogheda

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 18
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,951
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast