Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Fleming, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹Born
23 Oct 162332.8AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
31 Dec 162332.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
2 Aug 165160.5DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Fleming:
Archbishop Thomas Fleming O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015