Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Saladino

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia e Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1784³BornNapoli
23 Dec 180925.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 183652.3SelectedBishop of Isernia, Italy
19 May 183753.3ConfirmedBishop of Isernia, Italy
Jun 1837²53.4Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
19 Jun 185268.4AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
27 Apr 186177.3DiedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Saladino
Bishop Gennaro Saladino (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia e Venafro

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 226
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016