Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Giuseppe Castelli Piratini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Targa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1727BornBologna, Italy
19 Aug 175326.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 178153.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
29 Apr 178153.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giuseppe Castelli Piratini:
Bishop Paolo Giuseppe Castelli Piratini (born ) Titular Bishop of Targa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015