Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal de’ Medici

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1595BornFlorence, Italy
2 Dec 161520.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 May 161621.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
2 Oct 162328.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
17 Oct 164449.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
12 Dec 164449.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
6 Mar 164550.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
23 Oct 164550.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
29 Apr 165257.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Sep 165257.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
17 Jun 166671.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Carlo de’ Medici:
Cardinal Carlo de’ Medici (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 50.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013