Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leopoldo Cardinal de’ Medici

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1617BornFlorence, Italy
12 Dec 166750.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Apr 166850.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
14 May 167052.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
10 Nov 167557.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo de’ Medici:
Leopoldo Cardinal de’ Medici (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

  • a cardinal for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015