Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Ferdinando de’ Medici

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1549BornFlorence
6 Jan 156313.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156515.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
10 May 158535.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
7 Jan 158737.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
28 Nov 158839.3ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
22 Feb 160959.6Died

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando de’ Medici:
Layman Ferdinando de’ Medici (born , died ) of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 25.9 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jan 1563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013