Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mateo Delgado y Moreno

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1754BornOliva de Jérez
22 Dec 180046.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
1 Feb 180147.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
9 Aug 180248.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Badajoz, Spain
16 Feb 184187.0DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Delgado y Moreno:
Archbishop Mateo Delgado y Moreno (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 294, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 119, Number 631

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013