Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raniero Cardinal d’Elci

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1670Born
21 Dec 169929.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 173060.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
7 Jan 173160.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
27 Jan 173160.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
20 Dec 173767.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
May 1738³68.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
5 May 173868.1AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
23 Jun 173868.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 173868.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
15 Sep 174070.5ResignedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
10 Apr 174777.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
9 Apr 175383.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
12 Jan 175685.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
22 Jun 176191.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raniero d’Elci (VIAF: 89075376)
Raniero Cardinal d’Elci (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze
Ordained BishopChurch of the Jesuits, Archdiocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)S. Caterina da Siena Chapel, S. Sabina, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
  • a cardinal for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 2
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018