Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteu D’Angelis

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1687BornNanza
14 Jun 171023.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 175063.5AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
27 Sep 175063.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
Dec 1769³82.7DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteu D’Angelis:
Bishop Matteu D’Angelis (born , died Dec 1769) Bishop of Aleria

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015