Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincentius degl’Atti

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1658BornViterbo
29 Sep 169234.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 169536.4AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
30 Jan 169536.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
2 Jan 169637.3AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
Nov 1715³57.1DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincentius degl’Atti:
Bishop Vincentius degl’Atti (born , died Nov 1715) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112, and Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015