Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Della Cioppa

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1841Born
16 Mar 186726.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189655.4AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
5 Jul 189655.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
29 Jan 191776.0DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Della Cioppa (VIAF: 88970853)
Archbishop Angelo Della Cioppa (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellona, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopBasilica, Capua, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,050
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017