Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Joseph de Laulanhier

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Aegae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1718BornLe Cheylard, France
29 Jan 177657.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
24 Mar 177658.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
Jun 1789³71.2DiedTitular Bishop of Aegae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Joseph de Laulanhier: VIAF:59149483
Bishop Michel Joseph de Laulanhier (born , died Jun 1789) Titular Bishop of Aegae

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015