Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Mautone

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1816Born
21 Dec 183923.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 187660.5AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
24 Dec 187660.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
17 Feb 188871.6DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Mautone
Bishop Michele Mautone (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarigliano
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,466
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast