Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santo d’Inzillo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Mylasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1694Born
14 Apr 172025.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172834.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
19 Dec 172834.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
1755¹60.1DiedTitular Bishop of Mylasa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santo d’Inzillo
Bishop Santo d’Inzillo (born , died 1755) Titular Bishop of Mylasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoriano, Diocese of Mileto, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Domenico Soriano, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 65
  • b/c2+: AT, 26 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast