Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo d’Alfonso

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1800BornScapoli
27 Apr 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 184746.3SelectedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
12 Apr 184746.5ConfirmedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
18 Apr 184746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
23 Dec 188080.2DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo d’Alfonso:
Bishop Vincenzo d’Alfonso (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 446

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013