Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Cuculla

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1787¹Born
10 Sep 184760.6AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
5 Dec 184760.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
14 Jan 185366.0AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
24 Mar 186477.2DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Cuculla
Archbishop François Cuculla (born 1787, died ) Archbishop of Naxos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyros, Diocese of Syros (e Milos)
Ordained BishopSyros, Diocese of Syros (e Milos)

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 404, and Page 498
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 43
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,733

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast