Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Cranmer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489¹Born
21 Feb 153344.1AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
30 Mar 153344.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 155566.9ResignedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
21 Mar 155667.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Cranmer (VIAF: 2485707)
Archbishop Thomas Cranmer (born 1489, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Westminster

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 24
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast