Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Salcot (Capon), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bangor, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1534SelectedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
15 Apr 1534ConfirmedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
19 Apr 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
14 Aug 1539ResignedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
6 Oct 1557DiedBishop Emeritus of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Salcot (Capon):
Bishop John Salcot (Capon) O. Carm. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bangor

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 605
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013