Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Cid Monroy

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1743BornAguilar de Campos
29 Mar 180258.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
23 May 180258.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
8 Nov 182279.1DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Cid Monroy:
Archbishop Manuel Cid Monroy (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013