Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace V Cattan (Qattan)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1752¹BornAlep
28 Jun 181664.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
28 Jun 181664.4SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Jul 181664.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
28 Jul 181765.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
28 Jul 181765.5ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Mar 183381.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace V Cattan (Qattan):
Patriarch Ignace V Cattan (Qattan) (born 1752, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015