Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilios Haractengi (Araqtingi), B.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1816AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Oct 1816Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 May 1823DiedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Basilios Haractengi (Araqtingi):
Bishop Basilios Haractengi (Araqtingi) B.C. (died ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 214
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,718

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013