Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace Haggiuri (Ajjouri), B.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Diarbekir/me)


Events

DateEventTitle
Jul 1816³AppointedBishop of Foreign Diocese
16 Jul 1816Ordained BishopBishop of Foreign Diocese
Dec 1816²AppointedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Jun 1826AppointedAdministrator of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Dec 1831ResignedAdministrator of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
4 Aug 1834DiedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Haggiuri (Ajjouri)
Bishop Ignace Haggiuri (Ajjouri) B.A. (died ) Bishop of Zahleh e Furzol

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016