Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilios Elias Khalil, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateEventTitle
1822²AppointedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
2 Feb 1822Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 Jul 1836DiedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilios Elias Khalil:
Bishop Basilios Elias Khalil B.S. (died ) Bishop of Saïda

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2: CB, 6 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013