Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Maximos Givaid (Jouwed)

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1778BornGirgette, Egypt
1806²27.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 182445.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
15 Aug 182446.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
13 Nov 182547.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Aug 183153.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximos Givaid (Jouwed)
Patriarch Maximos Givaid (Jouwed) (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016