Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Casquete Prado, O.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cisamus

Titular See: (Orden de Santiago)(Prior of San Marcos de Leon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1765Born
18 Dec 179732.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
25 Mar 179832.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
2 Feb 183872.6DiedTitular Bishop of Cisamus

MicroData Summary for José Casquete Prado
Bishop José Casquete Prado O.S. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cisamus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuente de Cantos, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 117, Number 614
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast