Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annetto Casolani

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Mauricastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1815Born
3 Apr 184630.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
3 Apr 184630.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
24 May 184630.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
2 May 184731.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
1 Aug 186650.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Annetto Casolani
Bishop Annetto Casolani (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalta, Malta
Ordained BishopS. Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast