Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop NicolÚ Antonio Carafa, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1680³BornSummae
1696¹15.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 170424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 172040.4AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
26 Dec 172040.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
16 Sep 174161.2ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
16 Mar 174463.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
8 Sep 176383.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Antonio Carafa:
Archbishop NicolÚ Antonio Carafa O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 389
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1720, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015