Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Arduini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1691Born
8 Sep 171322.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 Mar 174654.5AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
12 Apr 174654.6Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
16 Dec 177786.2DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Arduini
Bishop Antonio Maria Arduini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbenga, Diocese of Albenga

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast