Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Agostino Bernabei, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1685Born
25 Feb 170822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Apr 172843.0AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
18 Apr 172843.0Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
23 Dec 172944.7AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
10 Mar 173448.9DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Agostino Bernabei
Bishop Ferdinando Agostino Bernabei O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92, and Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast