Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal di Canossa

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1809Born
1839²29.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1841²31.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1852¹42.6IncardinatedPriest of Verona, Italy
24 Aug 186152.3SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
30 Sep 186152.4ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
23 Jan 186252.7Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
12 Mar 187767.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187767.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
12 Mar 190090.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi di Canossa (VIAF: 28510890)
Luigi Cardinal di Canossa (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona
Ordained PriestModena
Ordained BishopCathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Verona, Diocese of Verona

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
  • a cardinal for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 587, and Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017