Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Torfanini

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1584AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
24 Feb 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
13 Feb 1591DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Torfanini
Bishop Vincenzo Torfanini (died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalace Chapel, Bologne, Archdiocese of Bologna
Death PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast