Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Kostka

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
4 Jun 157442.4AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
4 Sep 157543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 Jan 159563.0DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Kostka (VIAF: 34888616)
Bishop Piotr Kostka (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLubaw

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast